WI AB1042 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 20.255 (2) (fu), 48.78 (2) (L), 49.32 (6m), 69.20 (3) (h), 103.005 (14m), 115.7915 (8m), 118.30 (2) (b) 5., 118.301 (3) (c), 118.33 (6) (c), 118.38 (4), 118.60 (title) and (1) (am), 118.60 (2) (a) 1. b., c. and d., 118.60 (2) (a) 2., 118.60 (2) (a) 3., 118.60 (2) (a) 6. c. and d., 118.60 (2) (a) 7. a., 118.60 (2) (ag) (intro.), 118.60 (2) (ag) 1. b. and c., 118.60 (2) (ag) 2. a., 118.60 (2) (ag) 2. b., 118.60 (2) (ag) 4., 118.60 (2) (be), (bm) and (bs), 118.60 (3) (ar), 118.60 (3) (b), 118.60 (3) (c), 118.60 (3) (d), 118.60 (4) (bg) 1., 2. and 4., 118.60 (4) (bg) 5., 118.60 (4v), 118.60 (6m) (intro.) and (a) (intro.) and (b), 118.60 (7) (am) 2m. c., 118.60 (7) (b) (intro.) and 2m., 118.60 (7) (d) (intro.) and 3., 118.60 (12), 119.23, 119.23 (2) (ag) 1. b. and c., 119.23 (2) (ag) 2. b., 121.08 (4) (b) 1. and 3. and 938.78 (2) (L); to renumber 118.60 (6p) (a) 2.; to renumber and amend 118.60 (1) (intro.), (ab), (ad), (af), (ag), (bn), (c), (cm), (d) and (g), 118.60 (2) (a) (intro.), 118.60 (2) (a) 1. a., 118.60 (2) (a) 4., 118.60 (2) (a) 5., 118.60 (2) (a) 6. a., 118.60 (2) (a) 6. b., 118.60 (2) (a) 7. b., 118.60 (2) (a) 7. c., 118.60 (2) (a) 8., 118.60 (2) (a) 9., 118.60 (2) (ag) 1., 118.60 (2) (ag) 2. c., 118.60 (2) (ag) 5., 118.60 (2) (ar), 118.60 (2) (c) 1., 118.60 (2) (c) 2., 118.60 (2) (d), 118.60 (3) (a) (intro.), 118.60 (3) (a) 1m., 2m., 3., 4. and 5., 118.60 (3m) (a), 118.60 (3m) (am), 118.60 (3m) (b), 118.60 (3m) (c), 118.60 (4) (a), 118.60 (4) (bg) 3., 118.60 (4) (c), 118.60 (4d) (a), 118.60 (4d) (b), 118.60 (4m), 118.60 (4r), 118.60 (4s), 118.60 (5), 118.60 (6), 118.60 (6m) (a) 1. to 9., 118.60 (6m) (bm), 118.60 (6m) (c), 118.60 (6m) (d), 118.60 (6p) (a) 1., 118.60 (6p) (b), 118.60 (7) (ad) 1., 118.60 (7) (ad) 2., 118.60 (7) (ad) 3., 118.60 (7) (ag), 118.60 (7) (am) 1m., 118.60 (7) (am) 2m. b., 118.60 (7) (am) 3., 118.60 (7) (an), 118.60 (7) (b) 1., 118.60 (7) (b) 2., 118.60 (7) (b) 3., 118.60 (7) (b) 3m., 118.60 (7) (b) 4. to 6., 118.60 (7) (c), 118.60 (7) (d) 1. a., 118.60 (7) (d) 1. b., 118.60 (7) (dr), 118.60 (7) (e), 118.60 (7) (em) 1. and 2., 118.60 (7) (g), 118.60 (7) (h), 118.60 (7m) (a) (intro.), 1. and 2., (b) and (c), 118.60 (9), 118.60 (9m), 118.60 (10) (a) (intro.), 1., 2., 3., 5., 6., 7. and 8., 118.60 (10) (am), 118.60 (10) (ar), 118.60 (10) (b), 118.60 (10) (c), 118.60 (10) (d) and 118.60 (11); to consolidate, renumber and amend 118.60 (2) (ag) 1. (intro.) and a., 118.60 (6p) (intro.) and (a) (intro.), 118.60 (7) (am) 2m. (intro.) and a., 118.60 (7) (b) 7. a. and b., 119.23 (2) (ag) 1. (intro.) and a. and 121.08 (4) (b) (intro.) and 2.; to amend 20.255 (1) (j), 20.255 (2) (fr), 20.255 (2) (fv), 39.51 (2), 39.51 (3) (e), 39.51 (4) (intro.), 49.83, 115.28 (54m), 115.364 (1) (am), 115.383 (1) (c), 115.383 (2) (intro.), 115.383 (3) (b), 115.383 (4), 115.383 (5), 115.385 (2), 115.385 (3) (intro.), 115.385 (3) (b), 115.385 (4), 115.39 (1) (b) 2., 115.39 (3) (a) 2. b., 115.7915 (4m) (e) 2., 115.7915 (6) (e), 115.7915 (6) (i), 115.7915 (6) (k), 118.015 (1m) (c) and (d), 118.015 (5), 118.124 (1) (a), 118.125 (4), 118.30 (1g) (a) 3., 118.30 (1g) (a) 4., 118.30 (1s) (intro.), 118.30 (1s) (a), 118.30 (1s) (b), 118.30 (1s) (bm), 118.30 (1s) (c), 118.30 (1s) (cm), 118.30 (1s) (d), 118.30 (1t), 118.30 (2) (b) 1., 118.30 (2) (b) 2., 118.30 (2) (b) 6., 118.30 (5m), 118.301 (3) (d), 118.301 (4) (a), 118.33 (1) (f) 2m., 118.33 (1) (f) 2r., 118.33 (1) (f) 3., 118.33 (1m) (a) 1., 118.33 (1m) (a) 2. a., 118.33 (1m) (a) 2. b., 118.33 (1m) (a) 3., 118.33 (1m) (b), 118.33 (6) (cr), 118.40 (2r) (e) 2p. a., 118.56 (1), 118.57 (1), 118.57 (2), 118.60 (2) (a) 3. a., 118.60 (2) (ag) 2. a., 118.60 (2) (ag) 4., 118.60 (2) (ar), 119.23 (2) (a) 3., 119.23 (2) (ag) 2. a., 119.23 (2) (ag) 4., 119.23 (2) (ar), 119.33 (2) (b) 3. c., 119.46 (1), 119.9002 (2) (d) 3. (intro.), 121.07 (2) (b), 121.085, 121.137 (2), 121.91 (2m) (c) 1., 121.91 (2m) (c) 4., 121.91 (2m) (d) 1., 121.91 (2m) (d) 4., 121.91 (4) (n) 1., 146.89 (1) (d) 2., 146.89 (1) (g) 3. and 938.49 (2) (b); to repeal and recreate 115.7915 (1) and 115.7915 (2) (c); and to create 115.001 (3t), 115.7915 (2) (i), 115.7915 (2m), 115.7915 (4) (c), 115.7915 (4m) (g), 115.7915 (6) (em), 115.7915 (6) (L), 115.7915 (6) (m), 115.7915 (6) (n), 115.7915 (8) (am), 115.7915 (8) (ap), subchapter I (title) of chapter 118 [precedes 118.001], 118.60 (2) (ag) 2. c., subchapter II (title) of chapter 118 [precedes 118.70], 118.70 (3), (6), (7), (8), (9), (11), (12), (16), (17), (18) and (20), 118.71, 118.72 (title), 118.72 (1) (b), 118.72 (1) (c), 118.72 (2), 118.72 (3) (title), 118.72 (3) (d), 118.72 (4), 118.73 (title) and (1), 118.74 (title), 118.74 (3) (title), 118.74 (3) (a) 2., 118.74 (3) (b) 2., 118.74 (4) (title), 118.75 (title), 118.75 (2), 118.75 (3) (intro.), 118.76 (title) and (2) (title), 118.76 (1) (a) 1. and 2., 118.76 (4), 118.76 (5), 118.76 (7), 118.77 (title), 118.77 (1) (b), 118.77 (1) (d), 118.77 (2) (b) to (e), 118.78 (title), 118.78 (1) (intro.), 118.79 (title), 118.79 (5), 118.80 (title), 118.80 (4) (a) and (b), 118.80 (9) (title), 118.80 (9) (d) 2., 118.81 (title), 118.81 (1) (title), 118.81 (1) (c), 118.81 (2) (title), 118.82 (title), 118.82 (4) (title), 118.83 (title), 118.83 (2) (title), 118.84 (title), 118.84 (1), 118.84 (2) (title), 118.84 (4) (title), 118.84 (4) (a) 1., 118.84 (7), 118.85 (title) and (3) (title), 118.87 (6) and 119.23 (2) (ag) 2. c. of the statutes; Relating to: combining the choice programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Combining the choice programs and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Rodriguez |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 2 |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-02-06 | House | Representative Duchow added as a coauthor |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced |