WI AB1046 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.02 (6m) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: student identification used for voting. (FE)
Title
Student identification used for voting. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced |