WI AB105 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.33 (4) (c) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: operation of an all-terrain vehicle or utility terrain vehicle owned by an electric cooperative on a highway.
Title
Operation of an all-terrain vehicle or utility terrain vehicle owned by an electric cooperative on a highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-17 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-16 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-05 | House | Senator Ballweg added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-09-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2023-09-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2023-06-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-05-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Vos |
2023-03-15 | House | Representative Doyle added as a coauthor |
2023-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced |