WI AB1056 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 46.995 (2g) (c) and 46.995 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: funding methodology under the Children's Long-Term Support program. (FE)
Title
Funding methodology under the Children's Long-Term Support program. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Schraa [R] | Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Scott Johnson [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] |
Rep. Jerry O'Connor [R] | Rep. Barbara Dittrich [R] | Sen. Dan Feyen [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-20 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2024-02-20 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa |
2024-02-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced |