WI AB1086 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: funding for supplemental payments to hospitals with avoidable patient days under the Medical Assistance program, for enhanced nursing home reimbursement rates under the Medical Assistance program for residents with bariatric and extensive wound care needs, and for the complex patient pilot program. (FE)
Title
Funding for supplemental payments to hospitals with avoidable patient days under the Medical Assistance program, for enhanced nursing home reimbursement rates under the Medical Assistance program for residents with bariatric and extensive wound care needs, and for the complex patient pilot program. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Snyder [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] | Rep. Rob Summerfield [R] | Rep. Tony Kurtz [R] |
Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Health |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-02-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Read a second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Made a special order of business at 11:05 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2024-02-20 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Family Law, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2024-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2024-02-14 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2024-02-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2024-02-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Family Law |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced |