WI AB114 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.50 (1), 23.53 (1), 110.07 (1) (a) 1. and 3., 110.07 (1) (b), 165.755 (1) (b), 287.81 (title), 299.95, 302.46 (1) (a), 345.11 (1u), 345.20 (2) (g), 757.05 (1) (a), 814.85 (1) (a) and 814.86 (1); to repeal and recreate 23.50 (1); and to create 60.24 (3) (vm), 287.81 (1) (as), 287.81 (4) and (5) and 289.97 (2) of the statutes; relating to: open burning of solid waste, illegal storage or disposal of waste tires, and providing a penalty.
Title
Open burning of solid waste, illegal storage or disposal of waste tires, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-10-02 | LRB correction | |
2009-03-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-20 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-03-19 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | |
2009-03-19 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 9, Noes 5 | |
2009-03-18 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-16 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Molepske Jr. | |
2009-03-11 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-04 | Representative Sherman added as a coauthor | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab114 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB114.pdf |