WI AB115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 410.108; to repeal and recreate 410.108 (title); and to create 410.108 (2) and (3) of the statutes; Relating to: remittance transfers under the Uniform Commercial Code Article 4A, relating to funds transfers.
Title
Remittance transfers under the Uniform Commercial Code Article 4A, relating to funds transfers.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Sanfelippo [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Robb Kahl [D] |
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. John Lehman [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on calendar 5-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-04-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-04-25 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-04-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-04-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2013-04-01 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab115 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB115.pdf |