WI AB119 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-09 - Published 10-20-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Passed on October 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-09 - Published 10-20-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.16 (2) (cg) 1., 118.16 (2) (cg) 4., 118.165 (1) (e) and 938.345 (2); and to create 118.15 (1) (am) and 118.33 (6) (c) of the statutes; relating to: requirements for pupils enrolled in five-year-old kindergarten.
Title
Requirements for pupils enrolled in five-year-old kindergarten.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-09 | Published 10-20-2009 | |
2009-10-06 | Report approved by the Governor on 10-6-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 41 | |
2009-10-06 | Presented to the Governor on 10-5-2009 | |
2009-09-30 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2009-09-22 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-22 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 17, Noes 15 | |
2009-09-22 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-22 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-22 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | |
2009-09-21 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-09-21 | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-09-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-16 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 53, Noes 44, Paired 2 | |
2009-09-16 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Representatives Toles and Young added as coauthors | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 50, Noes 48 | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Davis | |
2009-09-16 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-10 | Placed on calendar 9-16-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-06-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-06-16 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 4 | |
2009-06-16 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 1 | |
2009-05-19 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-31 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Smith | |
2009-03-24 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2009-03-04 | Introduced |