WI AB125 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.347 (16) of the statutes; relating to: membership on the State Trails Council.
Title
Membership on the State Trails Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kestell [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Michael Endsley [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Joe Leibham [R] | Sen. Jim Holperin [D] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-11-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-10-20 | House | Placed on calendar 10-25-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-14 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2011-10-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-06-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-05-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties |
2011-05-05 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab125 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB125.pdf |