WI AB125 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-18)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Published 3-27-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-18)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Published 3-27-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 15.407 (2), 50.01 (4p), 252.01 (5), 448.01 (6), 448.03 (1) (b), 448.03 (3) (e), 448.04 (1) (f), 448.05 (5), 448.20, 448.21, 448.40 (2) (f) and 450.01 (15r); to renumber 448.970, subchapter VIII of chapter 448 [precedes 448.980] and subchapter IX of chapter 448 [precedes 448.985]; to amend 15.08 (1m) (b), 15.085 (1m) (b), 16.417 (1) (e) 3m., 46.03 (44), 48.981 (2m) (b) 1., 49.45 (9r) (a) 7. a., 50.08 (2), 50.39 (3), 55.14 (8) (b), 69.01 (6g), 70.47 (8) (intro.), 97.67 (5m) (a) 3., 118.2925 (1) (f), 146.81 (1) (d), 146.82 (3) (a), 146.89 (1) (r) 1., 146.997 (1) (d) 5., 154.01 (3) (intro.), 154.03 (2), 154.07 (1) (a) (intro.), 165.77 (1) (a), 255.07 (1) (d), 343.16 (5) (a), 440.035 (2m) (b), 440.035 (2m) (c) 1. (intro.), 448.015 (4) (am) 2., 448.02 (1), 448.03 (2) (a), 448.03 (2) (e), 448.03 (2) (k), 448.03 (5) (b), 448.035 (2) to (4), 448.037 (2) (a) (intro.) and (b) and (3), 448.62 (7), 448.695 (4) (a) and (b), 450.01 (16) (hm) 3., 450.11 (1), 450.11 (1g) (b), 450.11 (1i) (a) 1., 450.11 (1i) (b) 2. c., 450.11 (1i) (c) 2., 450.11 (8) (b), 462.02 (2) (e), 462.04, 961.01 (19) (a) and 971.14 (4) (a); and to create 15.406 (7), 49.45 (9r) (a) 7. e., 69.18 (1) (ck), 146.81 (1) (eu), subchapter VIII of chapter 448 [precedes 448.971], 450.11 (1i) (b) 2. cm., 450.11 (8) (f) and 990.01 (27s) of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of physician assistants, creating a Physician Assistant Affiliated Credentialing Board, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Regulation of physician assistants, creating a Physician Assistant Affiliated Credentialing Board, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Published 3-27-2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-26-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 23 |
2021-03-25 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-25-2021 by directive of the Speaker |
2021-03-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-25-2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | LRB correction |
2021-03-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Representative Drake added as a coauthor |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-03-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-03-16 | House | Representatives Bowen, Kurtz and B. Meyers added as coauthors |
2021-03-16 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-03-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-03-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-03-15 | House | Representative Wittke added as a coauthor |
2021-03-11 | House | Placed on calendar 3-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-03-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-03-10 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2021-03-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-03-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-03-09 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced |