WI AB136 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-18 - Published 11-25-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 12 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-11-18 - Published 11-25-2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 70.05 (5) (b); and to create 895.488, 943.13 (4m) (d) and 943.15 (1m) of the statutes; relating to: partially exempting an assessor and an assessor's staff from liability for trespassing, creating immunity from civil liability, and changing the notice requirements related to the revaluation of property by an assessor.
Title
Partially exempting an assessor and an assessor's staff from liability for trespassing, creating immunity from civil liability, and changing the notice requirements related to the revaluation of property by an assessor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-18 | Published 11-25-2009 | |
2009-11-12 | Report approved by the Governor on 11-12-2009. 2009 Wisconsin Act 68 | |
2009-11-10 | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2009 | |
2009-10-30 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2009-10-27 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-10-27 | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 25, Noes 7 | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended | |
2009-10-27 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-10-27 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-27 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing and take up | |
2009-09-23 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-09-17 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-16 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-09-16 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-16 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Representative Spanbauer added as a coauthor | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 adopted | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 2 adopted | |
2009-09-16 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 2 offered by Representative Hubler | |
2009-09-16 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-10 | Placed on calendar 9-16-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-08 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-08 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-09-08 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-08-25 | Executive action taken | |
2009-07-15 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 offered by Representative Hubler | |
2009-05-05 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-08 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Hubler | |
2009-04-02 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Hubler | |
2009-03-09 | LRB correction | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs | |
2009-03-09 | Introduced |