WI AB138 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-16)
Status: Enrolled on November 12 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Refused to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 58, Noes 38, Paired 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on November 12 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-23 - Refused to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 58, Noes 38, Paired 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 15.05 (1) (c) and 17.20 (1) of the statutes; relating to: the appointment and term of service of the secretary of natural resources and vacancies on the Natural Resources Board.
Title
The appointment and term of service of the secretary of natural resources and vacancies on the Natural Resources Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Refused to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, Ayes 58, Noes 38, Paired 2 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on calendar 2-23-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-11-16 | Report vetoed by the Governor on 11-13-2009 | |
2009-11-16 | Presented to the Governor on 11-13-2009 | |
2009-11-12 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2009-11-05 | Action ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 1 concurred in, Ayes 49, Noes 44 | |
2009-11-05 | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and concurred in as amended, Ayes 21, Noes 11 | |
2009-11-05 | Rules suspended | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-05 | Senate amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-11-05 | Senate substitute amendment 3 rejected | |
2009-11-05 | Read a second time | |
2009-11-05 | Senator Taylor withdrawn as a cosponsor | |
2009-11-05 | Senate substitute amendment 3 offered by Senator Grothman | |
2009-11-04 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Senate Organization | |
2009-10-22 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-10-22 | Report concurrence as amended recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 5, Noes 2 | |
2009-10-22 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-10-22 | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 2 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-10-22 | Report introduction of Senate Substitute Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-10-22 | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2009-10-22 | Report introduction of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-10-22 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2009-09-23 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-22 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 61, Noes 32, Paired 4 | |
2009-09-22 | Refused to lay on the table, Ayes 41, Noes 54 | |
2009-09-22 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 10 laid on table, Ayes 52, Noes 43 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 10 offered by Representative Gunderson | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 9 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 41 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 9 offered by Representative Gunderson | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 8 laid on table, Ayes 52, Noes 43 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 8 offered by Representative Gunderson | |
2009-09-22 | Decision of the Chair upheld, Ayes 52, Noes 43 | |
2009-09-22 | Decision of the Chair appealed | |
2009-09-22 | Point of order that Assembly amendment 7 not germane well taken | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 7 offered by Representative LeMahieu | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 6 laid on table, Ayes 52, Noes 43 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 6 offered by Representative Huebsch | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 5 laid on table, Ayes 51, Noes 44 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 5 offered by Representative Huebsch | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 4 laid on table, Ayes 54, Noes 41 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 4 offered by Representative Huebsch | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 52, Noes 43 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly substitute amendment 2 offered by Representative Huebsch | |
2009-09-22 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-17 | Placed on calendar 9-22-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-08 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-08 | Report passage recommended by committee on Natural Resources, Ayes 10, Noes 4 | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly amendment 3 offered by committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-09-02 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-09-02 | Executive action taken | |
2009-07-28 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Natural Resources | |
2009-03-09 | Introduced |