WI AB163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 443.02 (3) and 443.02 (4); and to create 443.015 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: retired credential status for certain professionals holding credentials granted by the Examining Board of Architects, Landscape Architects, Professional Engineers, Designers, and Professional Land Surveyors; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Retired credential status for certain professionals holding credentials granted by the Examining Board of Architects, Landscape Architects, Professional Engineers, Designers, and Professional Land Surveyors; extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures; providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures; and requiring the exercise of rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2020-01-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-14 | House | Representatives Brostoff and L. Myers added as coauthors |
2019-08-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-04-26 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kulp |
2019-04-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-04-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kulp |
2019-04-15 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2019-04-15 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab163 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB163.pdf |