WI AB177 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: transferring technical college district assets, liabilities, and employees to the technical college system board; limiting the authority of technical college district boards and prohibiting them from levying property taxes; increasing the rate of the state sales tax and use tax, and requiring a referendum. (FE)
Title
Transferring technical college district assets, liabilities, and employees to the technical college system board; limiting the authority of technical college district boards and prohibiting them from levying property taxes; increasing the rate of the state sales tax and use tax, and requiring a referendum. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. John Nygren [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-10-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-08-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Colleges and Universities |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab177 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB177.pdf |