WI AB185 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 69.18 (2) (b), 69.18 (2) (d) and 448.02 (3) (a); and to create 69.18 (2) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring use of the electronic system of vital records for medical certifications of death.
Title
Requiring use of the electronic system of vital records for medical certifications of death.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-01-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-01-11 | House | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2024-01-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-12-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Moses |
2023-08-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-04-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced |