WI AB202 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Published 4-3-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 7.41 (1), 7.41 (2) and 7.41 (3) (intro.) and (a) of the statutes; Relating to: certification of election observers.
Title
Certification of election observers.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Pridemore [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] |
Rep. Chad Weininger [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014 (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 rejected (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 54 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Published 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-2-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 177 |
2014-03-26 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 17, Noes 16 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 18, Noes 14 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Carpenter, Lassa, Hansen, L. Taylor, Shilling, Lehman, Miller, T. Cullen, Risser and C. Larson |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Placed at the foot of the 12th on the calendar of 3-11-2014, Ayes 18, Noes 15 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Elections and Urban Affairs, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Miller |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Elections and Urban Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 54, Noes 39 |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:06 PM on 11-14-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2013-10-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2013-10-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-08-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Pridemore |
2013-05-21 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pridemore |
2013-05-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced |