WI AB229 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Fiscal estimate received
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 13.093 (2) (b); and to create 13.59, 13.591, 16.59, 20.505 (1) (bm) and 227.112 of the statutes; Relating to: creation of a Joint Committee on State Mandates and required funding of state mandates. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creation of a Joint Committee on State Mandates and required funding of state mandates. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-03HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-24HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-31HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-30HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-30HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-23HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-05-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs
2019-05-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback