WI AB238 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 769.904; to amend 769.101 (6), 769.103 (1), 769.307 (2) (intro.), 769.501, 769.502 (3) (b), 769.506 (2) (c), 769.506 (2) (d), 769.611 (1) (a) 1. and 769.708 (3) (intro.); to create 769.101 (13p) of the statutes; and to affect 2009 Wisconsin Act 321, section 172m (1c) and 2009 Wisconsin Act 321, section 172m (2); Relating to: the effective date of amendments to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Title
The effective date of amendments to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Heaton [R] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] |
Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] |
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-06-29 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-06-29 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2015-06-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-06-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families |
2015-05-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab238 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB238.pdf |