WI AB238 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 23.33 (9) (b) 8.; to amend 20.370 (5) (ct), 20.370 (5) (cu), 23.33 (9) (a) and 23.33 (9) (b) 7.; and to create 20.370 (3) (au) of the statutes; Relating to: software, communications equipment, and maps for nonprofit organizations that promote the operation of all-terrain and utility terrain vehicles. (FE)
Title
Software, communications equipment, and maps for nonprofit organizations that promote the operation of all-terrain and utility terrain vehicles. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-11-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-07 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-11-06 | House | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor |
2023-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-19 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2023-10-03 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-09-19 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-05-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-04-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation |
2023-04-28 | House | Introduced |