WI AB241 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 5 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.50 (4) (a), 943.50 (4) (bf) and 946.82 (4); and to create 134.715, 943.50 (3m) (am) and 943.50 (4m) of the statutes; relating to: retail theft, proof of ownership for flea market sales, and providing penalties.
Title
Retail theft, proof of ownership for flea market sales, and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-04 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-03-04 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2010-03-03 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-19 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties received | |
2010-02-05 | Report of joint review committee on Criminal Penalties requested pursuant to s. 13.525 (5) Wisconsin Statutes | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing held | |
2009-11-09 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-11-06 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-11-05 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-11-05 | Representative Spanbauer added as a coauthor | |
2009-11-05 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-11-03 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-11-03 | Assembly amendment 2 adopted | |
2009-11-03 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representatives Danou and Molepske Jr. | |
2009-11-03 | Assembly amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 79, Noes 13 | |
2009-11-03 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Young | |
2009-11-03 | Read a second time | |
2009-10-29 | Placed on calendar 11-3-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-10-09 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-10-09 | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 9, Noes 1 | |
2009-10-01 | Executive action taken | |
2009-05-28 | Public hearing held | |
2009-04-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice | |
2009-04-30 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab241 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB241.pdf |