WI AB247 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 801.05 (11m) and 813.015 of the statutes; relating to: jurisdiction in matters relating to domestic abuse restraining orders and injunctions, child abuse restraining orders and injunctions, and harassment restraining orders and injunctions. (FE)
Title
Jurisdiction in matters relating to domestic abuse restraining orders and injunctions, child abuse restraining orders and injunctions, and harassment restraining orders and injunctions. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2012-01-17 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Public Safety, and Urban Affairs |
2011-10-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2011-10-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2011-10-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2011-10-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-10-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-10-20 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-10-20 | House | Read a second time |
2011-10-18 | House | Placed on calendar 10-20-2011 by committee on Rules |
2011-10-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Public Health and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2011-10-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Public Health and Public Safety, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2011-10-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-10-05 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Loudenbeck |
2011-10-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-09-22 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-09-07 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Health and Public Safety |
2011-09-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab247 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB247.pdf |