WI AB287 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 139.02 (1) and 139.02 (2) (b); and to create 16.964 (6), 20.435 (7) (gm), 20.505 (6) (g), 46.40 (15), 46.48 (31), 51.423 (16) and 139.27 of the statutes; relating to: increasing the tax on fermented malt beverages to fund law enforcement grants and alcohol and drug abuse treatment and prevention programs, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations.
Title
Increasing the tax on fermented malt beverages to fund law enforcement grants and alcohol and drug abuse treatment and prevention programs, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-10-13 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-25 | Assembly amendment 2 offered by Representative Berceau | |
2009-09-25 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Berceau | |
2009-07-01 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-06-15 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-06-02 | Read first time and referred to committee on Public Safety | |
2009-06-02 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab287 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB287.pdf |