WI AB294 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-8)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 100.75 of the statutes; Relating to: third-party food delivery services and providing a penalty.
Title
Third-party food delivery services and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2023-10-17 | House | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor |
2023-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dallman |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2023-09-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-09-19 | House | Representative Andraca added as a coauthor |
2023-09-14 | House | Senator Cowles added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-13 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-09-08 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2023-08-15 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-08-09 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2023-07-18 | House | Representative Madison added as a coauthor |
2023-06-22 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-06-08 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2023-05-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2023-05-25 | House | Introduced |