WI AB295 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 101.123 (3) (k) and 101.123 (3m) of the statutes; relating to: the designation of smoking rooms in lodging establishments.
Title
The designation of smoking rooms in lodging establishments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-09-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-16 | Report passage recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 7, Noes 2 | |
2009-09-16 | Executive action taken | |
2009-08-05 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-02 | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties | |
2009-06-02 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab295 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB295.pdf |