WI AB295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 450.062 (intro.); to renumber 450.062 (1) to (4); to renumber and amend 450.09 (2); to amend 450.06 (1), 450.06 (2) (b), 450.06 (2m), 450.09 (1) (a) and 450.09 (2) (title); and to create 450.01 (11o), 450.01 (21c), 450.02 (5), 450.03 (1) (L) and 450.09 (2) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: licensing and regulation of pharmacies and remote dispensing sites under the pharmacy practice law, the practice of pharmacy, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Licensing and regulation of pharmacies and remote dispensing sites under the pharmacy practice law, the practice of pharmacy, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from rule-making procedures, and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-10-25 | House | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-07-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-05-03 | House | Introduced |