WI AB303 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 16.965, 20.505 (1) (cm), 20.505 (1) (cn), 20.505 (1) (if), 66.0230 (2) (d) and 66.1001 (3m); to amend 20.505 (1) (ie), 36.11 (37), 59.69 (3) (a), 62.23 (2), 62.23 (3) (b) and 66.1001 (3) (intro.); and to create 66.1001 (7) and 66.1001 (8) of the statutes; relating to: comprehensive planning and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Comprehensive planning and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 56 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-03 - House - Assembly: Assembly amendment 3 laid on table (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2012-01-27 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Economic Development and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2012-01-26 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2012-01-25 | House | Messaged pursuant to Assembly Rule 50 (1) |
2011-11-03 | House | Refused to suspend rules to order immediately messaged, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 56, Noes 38, Paired 2 |
2011-11-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 3 laid on table, Ayes 58, Noes 36 |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 3 offered by Representative Bernard Schaber |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 2 adopted |
2011-11-03 | House | Assembly amendment 1 adopted |
2011-11-03 | House | Read a second time |
2011-11-01 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Rules and placed on calendar 11-3-2011 pursuant to Assembly Rule 45 (1) |
2011-10-27 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-25 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2011-10-25 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-10-25 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2011-10-25 | House | Assembly amendment 2 offered by committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2011-10-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-10-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-17 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Williams |
2011-10-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-10-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-06 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2011-10-05 | House | Senator Lasee added as a cosponsor |
2011-10-05 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2011-10-05 | House | Introduced |