WI AB318 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 71.05 (6) (a) 29., 71.05 (6) (b) 54., 71.10 (4) (k), 71.10 (10) and 71.83 (1) (ch) of the statutes; Relating to: creating tax-advantaged first-time home buyer accounts. (FE)
Title
Creating tax-advantaged first-time home buyer accounts. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-14 | House | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor |
2019-07-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab318 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB318.pdf |