WI AB366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.52 (13) and 77.53 (10); and to create 77.54 (69) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and use tax exemption for the sale of gun safes. (FE)
Title
Sales and use tax exemption for the sale of gun safes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-08-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-08-20 | House | Representatives Brostoff and Emerson added as coauthors |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab366 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB366.pdf |