WI AB367 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 940.04; and to amend 939.75 (2) (b) 1. and 968.26 (1b) (a) 2. a. of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating certain abortion prohibitions.
Title
Eliminating certain abortion prohibitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-28 | House | Representative Vining added as a coauthor |
2019-08-16 | House | Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor |
2019-08-13 | House | Representative McGuire added as a coauthor |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab367 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB367.pdf |