WI AB394 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-06 - Published 12-7-2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 85.27 of the statutes; Relating to: a driver education grant program. (FE)
Title
A driver education grant program. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-11-07 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-06 | House | Published 12-7-2023 |
2023-12-06 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 86 |
2023-11-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023 |
2023-11-08 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-8-2023 |
2023-11-07 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 29, Noes 2 |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2023-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor |
2023-11-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2023-11-03 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation and Local Government, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-10-18 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Local Government |
2023-10-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2023-10-17 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2023-10-17 | House | Representatives Steffen, Vining and O'Connor added as coauthors |
2023-10-17 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2023-10-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-17 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-10-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2023-10-17 | House | Read a second time |
2023-10-12 | House | Placed on calendar 10-17-2023 by Committee on Rules |
2023-10-12 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2023-10-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2023-10-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2023-10-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2023-10-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-10-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Donovan |
2023-10-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Donovan |
2023-09-22 | House | Representative Spiros added as a coauthor |
2023-09-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-09-19 | House | Representatives Mursau and Andraca added as coauthors |
2023-09-08 | House | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor |
2023-09-06 | House | Representative Moses added as a coauthor |
2023-09-05 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2023-09-05 | House | Introduced |