WI AB42 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 49.141 (1) (i), 767.84 (1) (a) and 767.855; to amend 48.02 (13), 48.27 (5), 48.396 (2) (dm), 48.42 (4) (b) 2., 48.837 (4) (e), 48.91 (2), 49.225 (2) (a), 49.855 (3), 49.855 (4m) (b), 69.15 (3) (a) (intro.), 69.15 (3) (a) 3., 565.30 (5m) (a), 767.407 (1) (c) (intro.), 767.41 (1) (b), 767.41 (1m) (intro.), 767.44 (1), 767.511 (1) (intro.), 767.511 (5), 767.513 (2), 767.55 (1), 767.55 (2) (am) (intro.), 767.55 (3) (a) 1., 767.55 (3) (d), 767.55 (4) (b) (intro.), 767.59 (2s), 767.73 (1) (a), 767.75 (1) (b), 767.77 (1), 767.78 (1), 767.80 (1) (intro.), 767.80 (1) (c), 767.80 (5m), 767.80 (5m), 767.80 (6m), 767.82 (2), 767.82 (2m), 767.87 (8), 802.12 (3) (d) 1., 802.12 (3) (d) 3., 808.075 (4) (d) 9., 808.075 (4) (d) 10., 852.05 (2), 938.02 (13), 938.27 (5) and 938.396 (2g) (g); and to create 49.141 (1) (i) 3., 49.141 (1) (j) 6., 767.80 (1) (hm), 767.804, 767.84 (1) (a) 1., 767.84 (1) (a) 2., 767.84 (1) (a) 3., 767.855 (1), 767.855 (2), 769.201 (7m) and 891.407 of the statutes; relating to: presumption and conclusive determination of paternity on basis of genetic test results and orders that may be granted on the basis of genetic test results. (FE)
Title
Presumption and conclusive determination of paternity on basis of genetic test results and orders that may be granted on the basis of genetic test results. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kestell [R] | Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Rep. Richard Spanbauer [R] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-10-03 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2011-10-03 | House | Report passage recommended by committee on Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 1 |
2011-10-03 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Children and Families, Ayes 6, Noes 0 |
2011-08-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2011-08-19 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kestell |
2011-06-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-24 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-03-08 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Children and Families |
2011-03-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab42 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB42.pdf |