WI AB438 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 440.075 of the statutes; relating to: applying a service member's military education, training, or other experience for purposes of satisfying certain requirements for a professional credential.
Title
Applying a service member's military education, training, or other experience for purposes of satisfying certain requirements for a professional credential.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2012-02-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-02-16 | House | Placed on calendar 2-21-2012 by committee on Rules |
2012-01-27 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2012-01-27 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2012-01-27 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2012-01-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2012-01-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2012-01-12 | House | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Wynn |
2011-12-20 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2011-12-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab438 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB438.pdf |