WI AB443 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to: ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Teaching Assistants' Association, AFT, Local 3220, AFL-CIO, for the 2007-09 biennium, covering employees in the program, project, and teaching assistants of the University of Wisconsin-Madison and University of Wisconsin-Extension collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds.
Title
Ratification of the agreement negotiated between the state of Wisconsin and the Teaching Assistants' Association, AFT, Local 3220, AFL-CIO, for the 2007-09 biennium, covering employees in the program, project, and teaching assistants of the University of Wisconsin-Madison and University of Wisconsin-Extension collective bargaining unit, and authorizing an expenditure of funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-10-20 | Laid on the table | |
2009-10-15 | Placed on calendar 10-20-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-25 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-09-25 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-25 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab443 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB443.pdf |