WI AB449 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.380 (3) (dm) and 41.567 of the statutes; Relating to: rural creative economy grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Rural creative economy grant program and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-02-14 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Rural Development, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Representative Joers added as a coauthor |
2024-01-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-11-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-11-08 | House | Representatives Emerson and Ratcliff added as coauthors |
2023-10-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-18 | House | Representative Schmidt added as a coauthor |
2023-10-18 | House | Senator Testin added as a cosponsor |
2023-10-05 | House | Representative Hurd added as a coauthor |
2023-09-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Rural Development |
2023-09-28 | House | Introduced |