WI AB456 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 84.10477 of the statutes; Relating to: designating and marking the Deputy Kaitie Leising Memorial Highway. (FE)
Title
Designating and marking the Deputy Kaitie Leising Memorial Highway. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-02-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2024-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2024-01-11 | House | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2024-01-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2023-12-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2023-11-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-10-16 | House | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor |
2023-09-28 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2023-09-28 | House | Introduced |