WI AB488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.01 (1); and to create 118.01 (3) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring school boards to make information about learning materials and educational activities used for pupil instruction available to the public. (FE)
Title
Requiring school boards to make information about learning materials and educational activities used for pupil instruction available to the public. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2021-09-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-23 | House | Placed on calendar 9-28-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-09-23 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2021-09-23 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 10, Noes 5 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-09-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Behnke |
2021-08-24 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2021-08-17 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-08-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-09 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-08-05 | House | Representative Plumer added as a coauthor |
2021-08-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2021-08-04 | House | Introduced |