WI AB5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-10)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-10)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 70.111 (25m) and 77.54 (23n) of the statutes; Relating to: sales and property tax exemptions for property used by commercial radio and television stations. (FE)
Title
Sales and property tax exemptions for property used by commercial radio and television stations. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 346 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 30, Noes 3 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 92, Noes 1 |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up |
2014-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from committee on State and Local Finance and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2014-01-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-29 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2013-02-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-11 | House | Senator Shilling added as a cosponsor |
2013-02-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State and Local Finance |
2013-02-01 | House | Introduced |