WI AB511 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 343.51 (1), 346.50 (2a) (intro.), 346.50 (3), 346.503 (1) and 349.13 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: use of special identification cards for persons with physical disabilities. (FE)
Title
Use of special identification cards for persons with physical disabilities. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-27 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-03-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Health and referred to committee on Transportation pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2013-11-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-20 | House | Senator Leibham added as a cosponsor |
2013-11-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2013-11-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab511 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB511.pdf |