WI AB511 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 15.06 (5) of the statutes; Relating to: relocating the offices of the Elections Commission. (FE)
Title
Relocating the offices of the Elections Commission. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] | Rep. David Armstrong [R] | Sen. Rachael Cabral-Guevara [R] |
Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Clint Moses [R] | Rep. Donna Rozar [R] | Rep. Ron Tusler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight, Ayes 5, Noes 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Representative Brooks added as a coauthor |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-09-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-08-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Accountability and Oversight |
2021-08-31 | House | Introduced |