WI AB528 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.324 (2); and to create 29.324 (1) (c) and 29.324 (3m) of the statutes; Relating to: restrictions on the hunting of antlerless deer by members of a group hunting party.
Title
Restrictions on the hunting of antlerless deer by members of a group hunting party.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Rob Swearingen [R] | Sen. Terry Moulton [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | House | Published 11-12-2017 |
2017-11-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 61 |
2017-11-09 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-09 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-03 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-02 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-02 | House | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-2-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-10-31 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-10-25 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-24 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier |
2017-10-19 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier |
2017-10-11 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-10 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-10-10 | House | Introduced |