WI AB53 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 94.02 (1); to amend 94.02 (2); and to create 94.02 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: time periods for the abatement of late blight of potatoes.
Title
Time periods for the abatement of late blight of potatoes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-02 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-02 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-02-08 | House | Representative Ripp added as a coauthor |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab53 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB53.pdf |