WI AB532 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.01 (13) and 71.05 (8) (b) 1.; and to create 71.05 (25m), 71.26 (3) (vm), 71.34 (1k) (p), 71.45 (2) (a) 21. and 71.83 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: income and franchise tax benefit for investment in Wisconsin opportunity zones and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Income and franchise tax benefit for investment in Wisconsin opportunity zones and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 8 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 8 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 5 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 4 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 3 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 1 rejected (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 136 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 26, Noes 7 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 8 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 7 rejected |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 8 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 withdrawn and returned to author |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended and taken up |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Placed on the foot of the 10th order of business on the calendar of 2-19-2020 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 7 offered by Senators Larson, Erpenbach, Bewley, Johnson, Carpenter and L. Taylor |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 6 offered by Senators Larson, Bewley, Johnson, L. Taylor and Carpenter |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 5 offered by Senators Risser, Larson, Carpenter, Hansen, L. Taylor, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 rejected, Ayes 19, Noes 14 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 4 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, Miller, Wirch, Hansen, L. Taylor, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 3 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, Miller, L. Taylor, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, L. Taylor, Miller, Wirch, Hansen, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senators Larson, Carpenter, Risser, L. Taylor, Miller, Wirch, Hansen, Johnson, Smith and Schachtner |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senator Miller withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2020-01-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative VanderMeer |
2019-10-31 | House | Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor |
2019-10-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-10-14 | House | Introduced |