WI AB535 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 118.40 (2r) (fm) of the statutes; relating to: establishing or contracting for the establishment of a charter school.
Title
Establishing or contracting for the establishment of a charter school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2009-11-05 | Laid on the table | |
2009-11-05 | Senator Taylor added as a cosponsor | |
2009-11-03 | Placed on calendar 11-5-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-11-03 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-11-03 | Report passage recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 1 | |
2009-11-03 | Executive action taken | |
2009-11-02 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2009-10-29 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab535 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB535.pdf |