WI AB594 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 84.30 (5r) (a); to amend 84.30 (5r) (title) and 84.30 (5r) (c); to repeal and recreate 84.30 (5r) (b); and to create 84.30 (5r) (a) 1., 84.30 (5r) (a) 2., 84.30 (5r) (a) 3., 84.30 (5r) (be) and 84.30 (5r) (bs) of the statutes; Relating to: outdoor advertising signs that do not conform to local ordinances and that are affected by certain transportation-related projects. (FE)
Title
Outdoor advertising signs that do not conform to local ordinances and that are affected by certain transportation-related projects. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:15 PM on 2-20-2018 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 26 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-02-15 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 3 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2018-02-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2018-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Vorpagel |
2017-12-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Billings |
2017-12-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Billings |
2017-12-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-12-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-11-15 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2017-10-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-10-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab594 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB594.pdf |