WI AB599 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 350.10 (1) (gm) of the statutes; relating to: a speed limit for the operation of snowmobiles during the hours of darkness.
Title
A speed limit for the operation of snowmobiles during the hours of darkness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 389 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-15 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-15 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-15 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-15 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-15 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on calendar 4-15-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2010-04-05 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-05 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Executive action taken | |
2010-04-01 | Public hearing held | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-03-04 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended | |
2010-03-04 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-03-04 | Assembly amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-03-04 | Read a second time | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on calendar 3-4-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-22 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-22 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-22 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | |
2010-02-17 | Executive action taken | |
2010-02-17 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing held | |
2009-12-18 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Kaufert | |
2009-11-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Tourism, Recreation and State Properties | |
2009-11-24 | Introduced |