WI AB607 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber and amend 20.505 (4) (er); and to create 20.505 (4) (er) 1. and 2. of the statutes; Relating to: funding for service award payments and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for service award payments and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04HousePublished 3-4-2020
2020-03-04HouseReport approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 139
2020-02-28HousePresented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker
2020-02-25HouseReport correctly enrolled on 2-25-2020
2020-02-20HouseReceived from Senate concurred in
2020-02-19SenateOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-19SenateRead a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended
2020-02-19SenateOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-19SenateRead a second time
2020-02-19SenateRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
2020-02-19SenateAvailable for scheduling
2020-02-19SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2020-02-19SenateReceived from Assembly
2020-02-18HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2020-02-18HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended
2020-02-18HouseOrdered to a third reading
2020-02-18HouseRead a second time
2020-02-18HouseRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Rules and take up
2020-02-18HouseSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-02-18HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-02-18HouseReport passage recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0
2020-02-12HouseExecutive action taken
2020-02-10HouseWithdrawn from committee on Rules and referred to joint committee on Finance pursuant to Assembly Rule 24 (3)(a)
2020-01-28HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-28HouseReport passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
2020-01-23HouseExecutive action taken
2020-01-09HousePublic hearing held
2019-12-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-11-15HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-11-15HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback