WI AB641 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senator Schachtner added as a cosponsor
Pending: House Aging and Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating to: grants to independent living centers and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grants to independent living centers and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseSenator Schachtner added as a cosponsor
2020-02-20HouseSenator Larson added as a cosponsor
2020-01-29HouseFiscal estimate received
2020-01-23HouseSenator Erpenbach added as a cosponsor
2019-12-02HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Aging and Long-Term Care
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback