WI AB661 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 23.47 (2); and to create 23.47 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: electronic issuance of dog training licenses. (FE)
Title
Electronic issuance of dog training licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2022-01-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-12-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-12-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2021-11-01 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-10-29 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced |