WI AB72 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 106.13 (2m); and to create 106.13 (2m) (a) to (p) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring certain occupational areas to be included in the youth apprenticeship program. (FE)
Title
Requiring certain occupational areas to be included in the youth apprenticeship program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 11, Noes 4 |
2020-01-14 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-03-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-03-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab72 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB72.pdf |