WI AB727 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Published 4-9-2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.115 (4) (s), 20.115 (7) (u), 20.285 (1) (t), 36.25 (6) (f), 93.60 and 93.65 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a commercial nitrogen optimization pilot program, providing crop insurance rebates for cover crops, creating a hydrogeologist position, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Creating a commercial nitrogen optimization pilot program, providing crop insurance rebates for cover crops, creating a hydrogeologist position, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Published 4-9-2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-8-2022. 2021 Wisconsin Act 223 |
2022-04-04 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-4-2022 by directive of the Speaker |
2022-03-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-15-2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Representative Brostoff added as a coauthor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-8-2022 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-23 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-23 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Read a second time |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:45 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 16, Noes 0 |
2022-02-22 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-18 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2022-02-18 | House | Referred to joint committee on Finance |
2022-02-18 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-18 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2022-02-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2022-01-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2022-01-04 | House | Representative Vruwink added as a coauthor |
2021-12-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kitchens |
2021-12-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-12-02 | House | Introduced |